NY S01821 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to publishing records of public interest by agencies and the legislature on their websites.
Title
Relates to publishing records of public interest by agencies and the legislature on their websites.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.998 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08357 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations