NY S01825 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces certain sentences of imprisonment for misdemeanors to three hundred sixty-four days.
Title
Reduces certain sentences of imprisonment for misdemeanors to three hundred sixty-four days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1825A |
2019-02-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05964 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken