NY S01826 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1826A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1826A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a tax credit for employer participants in federally- and/or state-recognized apprenticeship agreements.
Title
Creates a tax credit for employer participants in federally- and/or state-recognized apprenticeship agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1826A |
2016-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03465 (Same As) 2016-03-16 - print number 3465a