NY S01829 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A340B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A340B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state energy research and development authority to prepare a report regarding the replacement of decommissioned or dormant electric generating sites with renewable energy development and energy storage opportunities.
Title
Directs the New York state energy research and development authority to prepare a report regarding the replacement of decommissioned or dormant electric generating sites with renewable energy development and energy storage opportunities.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A340B |
2022-04-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1829B |
2022-04-26 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2022-04-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1829A |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.119 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.397 |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00340 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled