NY S01830 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - signed chap.102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the functions of the chief administrator of the courts; relates to reporting requirements.
Title
Relates to the functions of the chief administrator of the courts; relates to reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Senate | signed chap.102 |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.675 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1830C |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-08 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.66 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | rules report cal.66 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-08 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-05 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10609 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.675 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1830C |
2020-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1830B |
2019-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1830A |
2019-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05472 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.209
A10609 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - signed chap.102
A10609 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - signed chap.102