NY S01836 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Title
Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Edward Rath III [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3130 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1010 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO DISABILITIES |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03130 (Same As) 2022-02-04 - approval memo.170