NY S01840 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to information cable television companies must provide to subscribers regarding availability of required equipment at retail.
Title
Relates to information cable television companies must provide to subscribers regarding availability of required equipment at retail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1840A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1299 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02499 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES