NY S01861 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers and duties of the dormitory authority; amends the term "public library" to mean any library chartered by the state board of regents or incorporated under the not-for-profit corporation law constituting a public library, an association library or a free library.
Title
Relates to the powers and duties of the dormitory authority; amends the term "public library" to mean any library chartered by the state board of regents or incorporated under the not-for-profit corporation law constituting a public library, an association library or a free library.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.508 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2019-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1861A |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.104 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01583 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to libraries and education technology