NY S01866 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2020 and thereafter to $35,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the amount of money a retiree may earn in a position of public service in the year 2020 and thereafter to $35,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.106
2019-06-13Assemblysubstituted for a2858b
2019-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1286
2019-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-20SenatePRINT NUMBER 1866B
2019-05-20SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-02-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 1866A
2019-02-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-01-17SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02858 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - substituted by s1866b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01866&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01866&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01866
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01866&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01866A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01866&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01866B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01866&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1866#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1866#SC1

Bill Comments

feedback