NY S01867 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the higher education community service act to promote volunteer service by higher education students; creates a council for higher education community service to regulate and recognize persons and programs associated therewith; requires a report to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly.
Title
Enacts the higher education community service act to promote volunteer service by higher education students; creates a council for higher education community service to regulate and recognize persons and programs associated therewith; requires a report to the governor, temporary president of the senate and speaker of the assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.995 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03703 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education