NY S01868 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts parties liable for failure to obey or enforce certain child protective, domestic relations, or domestic violence orders of protection or temporary orders of protection from limited liability provisions pertaining to non-economic loss and providing for limitation of joint liability.
Title
Exempts parties liable for failure to obey or enforce certain child protective, domestic relations, or domestic violence orders of protection or temporary orders of protection from limited liability provisions pertaining to non-economic loss and providing for limitation of joint liability.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.180 |
2019-08-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.299 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | substituted for a5614 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.303 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05614 (Same As) 2019-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.180