NY S01870 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-03-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-27Senate1ST REPORT CAL.528
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-03-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-03-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-02-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-02-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.194
2017-01-11SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A02442 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback