NY S01870 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the submission of a twenty-year capital needs assessment to the metropolitan transportation authority capital program review board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the submission of a twenty-year capital needs assessment to the metropolitan transportation authority capital program review board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1870B
2019-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-26SenateAMENDED 1870A
2019-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.149
2019-01-17SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A04651 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - print number 4651b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback