NY S01885 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 1885B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Steuben to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Steuben to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 1885B
2020-03-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2020-01-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 1885A
2020-01-27SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-01-17SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09704 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - print number 9704a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback