NY S01886 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation and office of temporary and disability assistance to establish programs to encourage the removal and replacement of single-wall steel home heating oil storage tanks which are leaking or otherwise pose a threat to the environment.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation and office of temporary and disability assistance to establish programs to encourage the removal and replacement of single-wall steel home heating oil storage tanks which are leaking or otherwise pose a threat to the environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |