NY S01890 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1890A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1890A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed programs.
Title
Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1890A |
2020-07-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02798 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - reported referred to rules