NY S01897 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a two-thirds vote of the board in certain circumstances.
Title
Relates to requiring a two-thirds vote of the board in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00222 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS