NY S01905 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding disability to the equal protection requirement.
Title
Relates to adding disability to the equal protection requirement.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07035 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary