NY S01913 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to offer real property tax credits to certain volunteers who live in one municipality but who serve in neighboring municipalities.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to offer real property tax credits to certain volunteers who live in one municipality but who serve in neighboring municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.53 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.114 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05117 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - enacting clause stricken
A06712 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation
A06712 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation