NY S01925 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Removes caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes and traffic lights in the city of New York, increases penalties and creates a graduated schedule of fines for repeat offenders, and directs that fines be deposited in the general transportation account of the New York city transportation assistance fund; extends the effectiveness of part II of chapter 59 of the laws of 2010 amending the vehicle and traffic law and the public officers law relating to establishing a bus rapid transit demonstration program to restrict the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes and traffic lights in the city of New York, increases penalties and creates a graduated schedule of fines for repeat offenders, and directs that fines be deposited in the general transportation account of the New York city transportation assistance fund; extends the effectiveness of part II of chapter 59 of the laws of 2010 amending the vehicle and traffic law and the public officers law relating to establishing a bus rapid transit demonstration program to restrict the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2019-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1287
2019-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 1925B
2019-06-06SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 1925A
2019-05-09SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-01-17SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A01552 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - enacting clause stricken
A06777 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - print number 6777b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback