NY S01927 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.459
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.459
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the West Babylon Church of God of Prophecy Inc., to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for certain assessment rolls.
Title
Authorizes the West Babylon Church of God of Prophecy Inc., to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for certain assessment rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.459 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a6246a |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.930 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1927A |
2019-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06246 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.459