NY S01927 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing instruction in financial literacy for students in sixth through eighth grade; requires such instruction to include content on budgeting, savings, credit, debt, insurance, investment, and other issues associated with personal financial responsibility as determined by the education department.
Title
Relates to establishing instruction in financial literacy for students in sixth through eighth grade; requires such instruction to include content on budgeting, savings, credit, debt, insurance, investment, and other issues associated with personal financial responsibility as determined by the education department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05516 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - enacting clause stricken
A09652 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - referred to education
A09652 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - referred to education