NY S01938 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs child protective services to investigate and test, for the presence of controlled substances, a child under the age of 3 who was in the vicinity of a drug arrest of a parent, guardian or person legally responsible for the child; authorizes family courts to order the production of such a child for the purpose of conducting such testing; and directs the office of children and family services to compile data on such testing, and to submit a report thereon to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Directs child protective services to investigate and test, for the presence of controlled substances, a child under the age of 3 who was in the vicinity of a drug arrest of a parent, guardian or person legally responsible for the child; authorizes family courts to order the production of such a child for the purpose of conducting such testing; and directs the office of children and family services to compile data on such testing, and to submit a report thereon to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-05-02 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03393 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to children and families