NY S01950 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.621
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.621
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of court administration to collect and maintain data on limited English proficient litigants in the state; requires such information be publicly available.
Title
Requires the office of court administration to collect and maintain data on limited English proficient litigants in the state; requires such information be publicly available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.621 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.467 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1950A |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | amended on third reading 754a |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.376 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-10 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A754A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1950A |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.467 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00754 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.621