NY S01953 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1702 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1953A |
2018-02-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.367 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03953 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education