NY S01958 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the licensure of student loan servicers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the licensure of student loan servicers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO BANKS
2019-01-24SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-01-18SenateREFERRED TO BANKS

Same As/Similar To

A02071 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - reported referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback