NY S01960 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.695 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.401 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1960 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.294 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4474 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.401 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04474 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.695