NY S01969 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York city commissioner of the administration of children's services to obtain an order of consent from the court before allowing experimental drug testing on children under the care and/or control of the administration of children's services.
Title
Requires the New York city commissioner of the administration of children's services to obtain an order of consent from the court before allowing experimental drug testing on children under the care and/or control of the administration of children's services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.894 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08573 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health