NY S01975 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-31 - SIGNED CHAP.241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-31 - SIGNED CHAP.241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds tracks located in Westchester county to the tracks excepted from being considered regional tracks.
Title
Adds tracks located in Westchester county to the tracks excepted from being considered regional tracks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.241 |
2019-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.388 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7187 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.655 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A07187 (Same As) 2019-08-31 - SIGNED CHAP.241