NY S02004 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2004A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2004A
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits assessment of certain fees and costs upon wrongful denial of access to records under the freedom of information law when either the person has substantially prevailed, or if the agency failed to respond within the statutory time.
Title
Permits assessment of certain fees and costs upon wrongful denial of access to records under the freedom of information law when either the person has substantially prevailed, or if the agency failed to respond within the statutory time.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2004A |
2022-09-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.92 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.213 |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06459 (Same As) 2022-10-03 - print number 6459a