NY S02008 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.694
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.694
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires specification between partial approval of medical claims or payments and full denial of medical claims or payments on written notices to an insurer or an organization or corporation licensed or certified.
Title
Requires specification between partial approval of medical claims or payments and full denial of medical claims or payments on written notices to an insurer or an organization or corporation licensed or certified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.694 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.163 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a1677a |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-04-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2008B |
2021-04-21 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-04-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2008A |
2021-03-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.570 |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01677 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - substituted by s2008b