NY S02023 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2023A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2023A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of a separate office of family court judge for the county of Essex.
Title
Provides for the establishment of a separate office of family court judge for the county of Essex.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2023A |
2020-07-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-02 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04656 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary