NY S02043 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions of a chapter of 2018, extending provisions of law relating to catastrophic or reinsurance coverage issued to certain small groups, as proposed in S.8995 and A.11014.
Title
Amends provisions of a chapter of 2018, extending provisions of law relating to catastrophic or reinsurance coverage issued to certain small groups, as proposed in S.8995 and A.11014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.202 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.296 |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | substituted for a4947 |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.45 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04947 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.202