NY S02046 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to aggravated harassment of an employee by an inmate.
Title
Relates to aggravated harassment of an employee by an inmate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.706 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1699 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00659 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes