NY S02049 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the disclosure of discrimination, sexual harassment and sexual assault settlements to the civil rights bureau of the attorney general's office.
Title
Mandates the disclosure of discrimination, sexual harassment and sexual assault settlements to the civil rights bureau of the attorney general's office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2049B |
2019-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2049A |
2019-04-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03643 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes