NY S02053 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes school election wards in Rockland county union free and central school districts.
Title
Establishes school election wards in Rockland county union free and central school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.505 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.995 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2053A |
2021-04-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00249 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to education