NY S02065 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2065A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 2065A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school districts to establish an insurance reserve fund in an amount and manner determined by a qualified and independent actuary certified by the American Academy of Actuaries to be reasonable and necessary.
Title
Authorizes school districts to establish an insurance reserve fund in an amount and manner determined by a qualified and independent actuary certified by the American Academy of Actuaries to be reasonable and necessary.
Sponsors
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2065A |
2022-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-04-26 | Senate | DEFEATED IN LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-03-09 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04940 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to education