NY S02072 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Title
Relates to the right to clean air and water and a healthful environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.181 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | substituted for a2064 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-27 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.140 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02064 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY