NY S02093 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2093A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2093A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Endicott to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Jennifer Quinn who is employed by such village.
Title
Authorizes the village of Endicott to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Jennifer Quinn who is employed by such village.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2093A |
2020-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1180 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05391 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - print number 5391a