NY S02097 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any person, acting on behalf of a public officer, candidate or political committee, who solicits a contribution to a county or town committee for the benefit of a candidate to whom such direct contribution is unlawful, shall be guilty of a class D felony.
Title
Provides that any person, acting on behalf of a public officer, candidate or political committee, who solicits a contribution to a county or town committee for the benefit of a candidate to whom such direct contribution is unlawful, shall be guilty of a class D felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.884 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.315 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05829 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to election law