NY S02100 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of environmental conservation to report on coyote management techniques in urban and suburban areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the department of environmental conservation to report on coyote management techniques in urban and suburban areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.110
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a3199c
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2100B
2019-06-13SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-13Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-13AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-04-29AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-29SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-04-08SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2100A
2019-04-08SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-08Senatereturned to senate
2019-04-08AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-03-27Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-03-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.309
2019-01-22SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A03199 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s2100b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02100&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02100&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02100
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02100&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02100A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02100&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02100B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2100#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2100#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2100#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S2100#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02100&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback