NY S02120 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to business income base and certain small business taxpayers.
Title
Relates to business income base and certain small business taxpayers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.913 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2120A |
2018-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1860 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |