NY S02121 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A289C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A289C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enhancing coverage and care for medically fragile children; requires that health plans adopt policies and procedures tailored to the unique healthcare needs of this population.
Title
Relates to enhancing coverage and care for medically fragile children; requires that health plans adopt policies and procedures tailored to the unique healthcare needs of this population.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A289C |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.274 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2121C |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a289b |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2121B |
2021-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | AMENDED 2121A |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.375 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00289 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s2121b