NY S02125 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a person holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Lewis to reside in an adjoining county within the state.
Title
Authorizes a person holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Lewis to reside in an adjoining county within the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.396 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.352 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5195 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.270 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05195 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.396