NY S02129 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - DEFEATED IN WOMEN'S ISSUES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - DEFEATED IN WOMEN'S ISSUES
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of assault on a pregnant individual as a class D felony.
Title
Establishes the crime of assault on a pregnant individual as a class D felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | DEFEATED IN WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2022-03-14 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
Same As/Similar To
A04843 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to codes