NY S02139 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reduction of mercury in mercury-added lamps.
Title
Relates to the reduction of mercury in mercury-added lamps.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | approval memo.38 |
2019-12-13 | Senate | signed chap.647 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.75 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2139B |
2019-04-30 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-04-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2501a |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-02-27 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.61 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-29 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-23 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-04-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2501A |
2019-04-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2139B |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | AMENDED 2139A |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.75 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02501 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - approval memo.38