NY S02155 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1051
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation; amends chapter 500 of the laws of 2012, amending the civil practice law and rules, the general municipal law, the environmental conservation law, the public authorities law, the education law, the mental hygiene law, the private housing finance law, the facilities development corporation act, the administrative code of the city of New York, and chapter 154 of the laws of 1921 relating to the port authority of New York and New Jersey, relating to establishing a uniform process and requirement for the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation; amends chapter 500 of the laws of 2012, amending the civil practice law and rules, the general municipal law, the environmental conservation law, the public authorities law, the education law, the mental hygiene law, the private housing finance law, the facilities development corporation act, the administrative code of the city of New York, and chapter 154 of the laws of 1921 relating to the port authority of New York and New Jersey, relating to establishing a uniform process and requirement for the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A1051
2013-04-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-04-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-04-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.325
2013-04-10SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2013-01-14SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A01051 (Same As) 2013-05-02 - signed chap.24

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback