NY S02155 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions of the economically sustainable transportation demonstration program to provide an on demand transit service for seniors using automobiles driven by volunteer and paid drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends provisions of the economically sustainable transportation demonstration program to provide an on demand transit service for seniors using automobiles driven by volunteer and paid drivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to aging
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1703
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 2155B
2018-05-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2018-03-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to aging
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1538
2017-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-05-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 2155A
2017-05-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING
2017-01-12SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

A08229 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to aging

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02155&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02155&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02155
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02155&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02155A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02155&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S02155B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2155#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2155#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2155#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2155#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2155#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S2155#SC4

Bill Comments

feedback