NY S02160 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing notice of voting rights to persons released from local jails including written information distributed by the board of elections.
Title
Relates to providing notice of voting rights to persons released from local jails including written information distributed by the board of elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.453 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.417 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05321 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.202