NY S02161 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the flag to be flown at half-staff to commemorate the death of certain first responders who passed away in performance of emergency response activities in this state.
Title
Directs the flag to be flown at half-staff to commemorate the death of certain first responders who passed away in performance of emergency response activities in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.781 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.611 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02445 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken